EZRAS YISROEL TRUST

Charity number: 1086363
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £205.36k £130.88k £242.76k £255.90k £221.22k
Total expenditure £116.63k £127.67k £189.21k £291.15k £194.29k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A