TAUNTON VINEYARD CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Relief of poverty, Christian teaching and worship. Service to the community of Taunton, Somerset. Support of UK based and overseas Christian work.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Somerset
Governance
- 23 May 2001: Standard registration
- 09 May 2017: Funds received from 1107887 GROSVENOR CHURCH (WEST SOMERSET)
- TAUNTON VINEYARD CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicholas Jeffrey Webb | Chair | 06 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Habgood | Trustee | 19 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Grant John Mori | Trustee | 18 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jamie Higginbotham | Trustee | 21 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Brenda Cottey | Trustee | 21 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Karen Mann | Trustee | 21 November 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £197.32k | £148.47k | £120.78k | £140.17k | £150.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £176.83k | £136.32k | £104.94k | £114.20k | £101.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 25 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 25 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 05 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 05 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 11 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 11 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 10 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 31 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 16 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 16 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 13 FEBRUARY 2001 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION UPON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 3 OCTOBER 2010
Charitable objects
I. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH INCLUDING MISSIONARY ACTIVITIES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND OVERSEAS AND ALSO INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO THE PLANTING OF NEW CHURCHES AND ORGANISATIONS OR CONGREGATIONS; II. THE RELIEF OF THE POOR AND NEEDY; III. THE RELIEF OF THE SICK AND ELDERLY; IV. THE FURTHERANCE OF RELIGIOUS OR SECULAR PUBLIC EDUCATION; V. SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE OBJECTS AND FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE BODIES AND INSTITUTIONS AS THE MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SEE FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE TAUNTON DEANE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
2A Church Square
Taunton
Somerset
TA1 1SA
- Phone:
- 01823771466
- Email:
- info@tauntonvineyard.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window