BUGLIFE THE INVERTEBRATE CONSERVATION TRUST

Charity number: 1092293
Charity reporting is up to date (8 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 08 November 2021 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 08 November 2021 8 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 23 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 23 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 23 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 23 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 22 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 30 August 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 24 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 18 September 2017 On time Download