BUGLIFE THE INVERTEBRATE CONSERVATION TRUST

Charity number: 1092293
Charity reporting is up to date (8 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £1.57m £1.33m £1.15m £1.36m £1.57m
Total expenditure £1.53m £1.31m £1.32m £1.16m £1.22m
Income from government contracts £0 £25.50k N/A £21.52k N/A
Income from government grants £167.62k £135.66k N/A £163.23k £175.89k
Income - Donations and legacies £212.60k £157.69k £143.82k £340.07k £263.96k
Income - Other trading activities £9.66k £48.63k £46.77k £23.86k £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.35m £1.11m £947.01k £997.46k £1.30m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £3.81k £2.03k £2.06k £2.12k £4.96k
Income - Other £0 £9.50k £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £2.00k £1.00k £8.59k £104.80k £168.90k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.51m £1.20m £1.24m £1.07m £1.10m
Expenditure - Raising funds £26.78k £111.12k £42.99k £97.99k £119.40k
Expenditure - Governance £451 £9.27k £9.85k £9.80k £15.84k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £34.35k £0 £0