BUGLIFE THE INVERTEBRATE CONSERVATION TRUST

Charity number: 1092293
Charity reporting is up to date (8 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Wendy Brooks Trustee 10 January 2020 None on record
Richard Forster Trustee 02 July 2016 None on record
Christopher Spreadbury Trustee 30 July 2018 None on record
Richard Powell OBE Trustee 29 March 2021 None on record
Hayley Coristine Trustee 28 March 2019 None on record
Dr Rachel Hooper Trustee 01 December 2016 None on record
Eugenie Regan Trustee 29 March 2021 None on record
Michael Johnston Trustee 29 March 2021 None on record
Sarah Dawkins Trustee 29 March 2021 None on record
Nina Seale Trustee 29 March 2021 None on record