BARAKA COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1087721
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £92.21k £140.89k £216.88k £249.73k £157.41k
Total expenditure £85.76k £132.97k £196.41k £194.56k £161.47k
Income from government contracts £47.15k £87.57k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £23.43k £136.75k £25.05k £58.23k