Financial history COMMUNITY ADVICE AND LAW SERVICE LTD

Charity number: 1087214
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £3.72m £3.46m £3.54m £4.13m £4.25m
Total expenditure £3.61m £3.50m £3.48m £4.00m £4.11m
Income from government contracts £136.84k N/A £146.08k £125.00k £151.54k
Income from government grants £3.15m £3.21m N/A £3.60m £3.56m
Income - Donations and legacies £27.47k £953 £1.62k £1.28k £195
Income - Other trading activities £160.81k £57.93k £0 £1.14k £0
Income - Charitable activities £3.52m £3.40m £3.54m £4.13m £4.25m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £16 £28 £0 £11 £41
Income - Other £7.10k £1.02k £717 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.36m £3.43m £3.48m £4.00m £4.11m
Expenditure - Raising funds £252.16k £65.55k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £4.71k £5.87k £0 £6.05k £5.94k
Expenditure - Grants institution £2.58m £2.61m £0 £2.71m £2.59m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0