THE HARKNESS FELLOWS ASSOCIATION AND TRANSATLANTIC TRUST

Charity number: 1088426
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 17 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 03 June 2020 34 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2018 20 May 2019 20 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2017 11 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2016 21 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 Not Required