THE HARKNESS FELLOWS ASSOCIATION AND TRANSATLANTIC TRUST

Charity number: 1088426
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £9.21k £10.62k £9.93k £9.97k £9.88k
Total expenditure £8.77k £11.88k £15.53k £8.64k £8.28k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A