Accounts and annual returns THE FRIENDS OF THE CHURCH OF ST. JOHN THE EVANGELIST, WALWORTH

Charity number: 1088181
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 12 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 04 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 05 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 05 December 2019 On time
Annual return 31 March 2018 14 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 14 January 2019 On time
Annual return 31 March 2017 13 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 13 November 2017 On time