Financial history THE FRIENDS OF THE CHURCH OF ST. JOHN THE EVANGELIST, WALWORTH

Charity number: 1088181
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £41.37k £49.35k £37.00k £20.23k £2.54k
Total expenditure £17.25k £13.67k £52.38k £46.33k £22.17k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A