BELIEVERS FAITH MINISTRIES INTERNATIONAL TRUST

Charity number: 1086011
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £18.09k £20.93k £14.66k £14.22k £16.54k
Total expenditure £13.53k £12.52k £9.30k £11.47k £12.22k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A