Accounts and annual returns BRIXTON FULL GOSPEL CHURCH TRUST

Charity number: 1085892
Charity reporting is up to date (73 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 January 2021 13 January 2022 73 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2021 13 January 2022 73 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 January 2020 07 January 2022 432 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2020 07 January 2022 432 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 January 2019 13 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2019 13 May 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 January 2018 28 February 2019 119 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2018 28 February 2019 119 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 January 2017 13 November 2017 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2017 13 November 2017 12 days late Download Open in new window