Financial history BRIXTON FULL GOSPEL CHURCH TRUST

Charity number: 1085892
Charity reporting is up to date (73 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/01/2017 01/01/2018 01/01/2019 01/01/2020 01/01/2021
Total gross income £40.14k £68.38k £62.30k £87.49k £71.62k
Total expenditure £33.49k £74.94k £54.75k £90.73k £58.01k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A