Accounts and annual returns EVESBATCH PARISH COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity number: 1086692
Charity reporting is overdue by 124 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 124 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 124 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 11 November 2022 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 26 March 2022 146 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 20 November 2020 20 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 17 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required