Accounts and annual returns LINTON CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1087064
Charity reporting is overdue by 19 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2023 Overdue Overdue by 19 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Overdue Overdue by 19 days
Annual return 05 April 2022 14 October 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 28 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 27 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 26 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required