Trustees DACORUM DISTRICT CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU

Charity number: 1085882
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
LAURENCE LICHMAN Chair 08 June 2022
None on record
Paul Templeman Trustee 08 June 2022
None on record
Clare Miles Trustee 08 June 2022
None on record
Nicholas Rouse Trustee 08 June 2022
None on record
Sean Bolton Trustee 04 June 2018
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST LAWRENCE, BOVINGDON
Received: On time
HACRO
Received: On time
David Payne Trustee 07 February 2018
None on record
Michael Egan Trustee 07 February 2018
None on record
JAMES SALISBURY Trustee 20 May 2015
None on record
ANNA FOSTER Trustee 20 May 2015
None on record
MARK MERCER DEADMAN Trustee 08 October 2014
None on record
RONALD DAVID COXAGE Trustee
BOXMOOR AND WARNERS END NEIGHBOURHOOD ASSOCIATION
Received: 109 days late