HEADWAY MILTON KEYNES LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support and opportunities for social, vocational and cognitive rehabilitation for individuals who have survived an acquired brain injury. Information and support for carers and families of survivors of an acquired brain injury.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £50,259 from 1 government contract(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Milton Keynes
Governance
- 05 April 2001: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Patricia Grout | Trustee | 03 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
CHAIR Catherine Johnson | Trustee | 16 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dushal Mehta | Trustee | 23 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Matthew Long | Trustee | 17 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Jane Heales | Trustee | 21 February 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £64.84k | £100.43k | £78.90k | £73.38k | £108.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £78.98k | £81.59k | £84.96k | £89.75k | £91.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £25.88k | £27.10k | £34.69k | £34.46k | £50.26k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £25.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 24 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 04 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 04 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 5TH DECEMBER 2000
Charitable objects
1. TO PROVIDE SERVICES AND FACILITIES CALCULATED TO REHABILITATE AND RELIEVE FROM THEIR DISABILITIES PERSONS WHO HAVE SUFFERED HEAD INJURIES AND WHO RESIDE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OF GREAT BRITAIN AND NORTHERN IRELAND AND ARE RECEIVING OR HAVE RECEIVED MEDICAL TREATMENT THERE; 2. TO RELIEVE THE FAMILIES OF PERSONS WHO HAVE SUFFERED HEAD INJURIES; 3. TO ENCOURAGE, PROVIDE AND SET UP SELF-HELP GROUPS TO PROMOTE THE OBJECTS OF THE ASSOCIATION; 4. TO PROVIDE AND ARRANGE AFTER-CARE SERVICES FOR PERSONS WHO HAVE SUFFERED HEAD INJURIES; 5. TO PROVIDE AND FACILITATE THE PROVISION OF PERMANENT HOMES, OR SHORT STAY HOSTELS FOR SUCH PERSONS OR THEIR RELATIVES.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
518 Silbury Boulevard
Centre:MK
Milton Keynes
MK9 2AD
- Phone:
- 07595 907131
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window