FAMILY OF NURSERY DEVELOPMENT ( F O N D )
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supporting pre-school children with special needs who attend the Children's Resource Centre nursery in Dartford, Kent.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 13 March 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Kent
Governance
- 22 October 2002: Standard registration
- 23 March 2016: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 23 March 2016: Funds transferred to 1148686 STEP AND LEARN
- 23 March 2016: Funds transferred to 291623 ARROW RIDING CENTRE FOR DISABLED
- 23 March 2016: Funds transferred to 1170125-1 NEWLIFE FOUNDATION FOR DISABLED CHILDREN
- 23 March 2016: Funds transferred to 1136331 SLIDE AWAY
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 13/03/2010 | 13/03/2011 | 13/03/2012 | 13/03/2013 | 13/03/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.22k | £11.97k | £5.38k | £2.74k | £2.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £700 | £2.60k | £6.19k | £799 | £4.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 13 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 13 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 13 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 13 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 13 March 2014 | 09 January 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 13 March 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 13 March 2013 | 21 January 2014 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 13 March 2013 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 8 MAY 2001.
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") ARE: A) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PRE-SCHOOL CHILDREN OF TWO TO FIVE YEARS OF AGE WHO HAVE COMPLETED SPECIAL NEEDS AND WHO ATTEND THE CHILDREN'S RESOURCE CENTRE (CRC) NURSERY (THE CRC NURSERIES RUN FOR CHILDREN IN THE DARTFORD GRAVESEND AND SWANLEY AREAS AND IS AT THE DARENT VALLEY HOSPITAL, DARENT WOOD ROAD, DARTFORD, KENT, DA2 8DA). B) TO ENABLE THESE CHILDREN TO HAVE EQUALITY OF OPPORTUNITY WITHIN THE COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
KENT - DARTFORD, SWANLEY, GRAVESHAM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window