DAGORETTI CORNER STREET CHILDREN PROGRAMME

Charity number: 1104382
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 22 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 22 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 23 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 23 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 25 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 25 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 23 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 23 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 26 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required