DAGORETTI CORNER STREET CHILDREN PROGRAMME

Charity number: 1104382
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £15.00k £38.79k £29.04k £34.78k £25.04k
Total expenditure £25.50k £33.59k £37.17k £51.21k £28.17k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A