BOURNEMOUTH CHINESE SCHOOL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Third Year to celebrate CNY in Bournemouth Library. In 25 Feb 2014, we had held a great event to celebration CNY in Bournemouth Library; we had over 300+ resident to participant. Celebration Programme such as Tea tasting/Origami/Face painting/Kung Fu/Calligraphy workshops; Entertainment-Lion dance/Kung Fu/Dance/Costumes/Chinese Cooking/Drums. Art & History introduction for a month.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bournemouth
- Dorset
- Poole
Governance
- 27 July 2001: Standard registration
- 11 January 2016: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 11 January 2016: Funds transferred to 1162663 WISDOM (ZHIHUI) FOUNDATION
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2010 | 31/08/2011 | 31/08/2012 | 31/08/2013 | 31/08/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.64k | £16.53k | £11.86k | £15.80k | £14.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.92k | £13.69k | £16.23k | £16.21k | £14.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2014 | 11 February 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2013 | 26 February 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2012 | 13 February 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2012 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 SEPTEMBER 2000 AS AMENDED 3 SEPTEMBER 2006 AND 9 NOVEMBER 2008.
Charitable objects
A) ADVANCE THE EDUCATION, AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, FOR THE RECREATION AND LEISURE, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CULTURAL AWARENESS AND IMPROVE THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE CHINESE COMMUNITY IN BOURNEMOUTH, POOLE, DORSET AND THE SURROUNDING AREA. B) PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED B) PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED. THE ORGANISATION SHALL BE NON-PARTY IN POLITICS AND NON-SECTARIAN IN RELIGION.
Area of benefit
THE CHINESE COMMUNITY IN BOURNEMOUTH, POOLE, DORSET AND THE SURROUNDING AREA.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window