THE BRITISH MUSEUM FRIENDS

Charity number: 1086080
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

19 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MARK ANDREW PEARS Trustee 21 July 2017
THE PEARS FAMILY CHARITABLE FOUNDATION Received: On time
Professor Dame Winifred Mary Beard Trustee 19 March 2020 None on record
Priyanka Wadhawan Trustee 01 December 2021 None on record
Professor Abhijit Vinayak Banerjee Trustee 24 September 2021 None on record
Sir Mark Jeremy Walport Trustee 01 December 2020 None on record
Philipp Michael Hildebrand Trustee 01 August 2019 None on record
Muriel Gray Trustee 10 March 2016 None on record
SIR ANDREW CHARLES MAYFIELD Trustee 01 June 2018 None on record
George Osborne Chair 01 September 2021 None on record
George Garfield Weston Trustee 25 March 2019 None on record
Elizabeth Pauline Lucy Corley Trustee 02 October 2016 None on record
CLARISSA MARY FARR Trustee 02 October 2016
AFRICAN GIFTED FOUNDATION Received: On time
Dr Nemat Shafik Trustee 05 January 2016 None on record
Grayson Perry CBE RA Trustee 02 April 2015
THE ROYAL ACADEMY OF ARTS Received: On time
Professor Sarah Elizabeth Worthington Trustee 01 March 2020 None on record
Dr CHRISTOPHER HUGH GOSDEN Trustee 02 August 2018
OXFORD ARCHAEOLOGY LIMITED
VALE OF WHITE HORSE & RIDGEWAY ARCHAEOLOGICAL & HISTORICAL TRUST Received: On time
Dame Vivian Hunt Trustee 25 March 2019
TEACH FIRST Received: On time
Lord Jonathan Peter Marland of Odstock Trustee 01 December 2021 None on record
SIR PAUL RUDDOCK Trustee 02 October 2016
THE SECOND HALF FOUNDATION Received: On time