BERKSHIRE FEDERATION OF TOWNSWOMEN'S GUILDS

Charity number: 1085960
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/01/2017 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020 31/01/2021
Total gross income £4.48k £2.52k £5.59k £4.01k £1.35k
Total expenditure £4.42k £2.39k £3.47k £5.29k £1.21k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A