CYLCH MEITHRIN LLANDYSILIO

Charity number: 1089716
Charity reporting is overdue by 133 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Total gross income £15.37k £17.69k £13.90k £16.19k £15.44k
Total expenditure £16.08k £19.97k £20.39k £20.22k £14.66k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £751 £265 £40 N/A £750