RHEMA INTERNATIONAL CHURCH (MILTON KEYNES) HOUSE OF PRAYER FOR ALL NATIONS

Charity number: 1089443
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £78.29k £86.92k £91.92k £205.00k £63.18k
Total expenditure £75.34k £84.69k £87.98k £196.48k £60.98k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A