Trustees BASINGSTOKE- OLD BASING U3A
Charity number: 1086263

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Dodge | Chair | 05 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Charles David Piers Miller | Trustee | 23 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jean Anne Herbert | Trustee | 14 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Janet Mary Field | Trustee | 09 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Richard Howard Field | Trustee | 24 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Philip James Ryan | Trustee | 11 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Simon Michael Offord McCarthy | Trustee | 01 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Marilyn Bennett | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alastair Sim | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas John Gosby | Trustee | 10 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Roderick Marshall | Trustee | 12 August 2020 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.