LLANYBYDDER FAMILY CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
support and activities for families with pre-school children
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £3,000 from 1 government contract(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Carmarthenshire
Governance
- 13 July 2001: Standard registration
- CANOLFAN DEULUOL (Working name)
- CANOLFAN DEULUOL TY'R TEULU FAMILY CENTRE LLANYBYDDER (Working name)
- FAMILY CENTRE LLANYBYDDER (Working name)
- LLANYBYDDER FAMILY CENTRE CANOLFAN DEULUOL TY R TEUL (Working name)
- TY'R TEULU (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dawn Hamblin | Trustee | 21 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Catrin Rachel Thomas | Trustee | 21 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Ann White | Trustee | 22 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Heather Jones | Trustee | 19 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ann Smith | Trustee | 15 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
SARAH Jones | Trustee | 13 January 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.76k | £24.82k | £44.43k | £57.27k | £23.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £36.80k | £27.09k | £43.07k | £39.36k | £38.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £2.00k | £3.00k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £7.07k | £2.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 10 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 10 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 03 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28/02/2001 AS AMENDED ON 20/11/2007 AS AMENDED ON 20/09/2012 as amended on 24 Jan 2023
Charitable objects
I. THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF DISTRESS WITHIN FAMILY RELATIONSHIPS BY THE PROVISION OF A RESOURCE AND ADVICE CENTRE AND BY THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN GOOD PARENTING SKILLS. II. THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES FOR AND IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
LLANYBYDDER AND SURROUNDING DISTRICT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Llanybydder Family Centre
Cwm Aur
Hafan Unit
Heol y Dderi
Llanybydder
SA40 9AB
- Phone:
- 01570481617
- Email:
- LLANYBYDDERFC2@GMAIL.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window