VOLUNTARY IMPACT NORTHAMPTONSHIRE LTD

Charity number: 1087513
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £644.31k £738.26k £790.02k £724.76k £942.37k
Total expenditure £700.27k £792.13k £791.54k £740.24k £789.88k
Income from government contracts £376.99k £300.00k £445.04k £175.00k £88.81k
Income from government grants £15.20k £82.72k £70.25k £68.24k £214.26k
Income - Donations and legacies £232.95k £248.13k £287.35k £4.04k £12.33k
Income - Other trading activities £15.89k £10.73k £33.31k £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £395.03k £478.83k £469.34k £694.86k £667.81k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £442 £575 £29 £323 £583
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £25.54k £261.65k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £691.23k £764.71k £791.54k £740.24k £789.88k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £21.30k £3.78k £16.86k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £9.04k £27.42k £0 £0 £0