FOLKESTONE MIGRANT SUPPORT GROUP

Charity number: 1089235
Removed charity
Governing document
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 25 JANUARY, 2001 AND AMENDED ON 9 SEPTEMBER, 2001 AND 15 OCTOBER 2004
Charitable objects
1.TO ASSIST IN THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND DISTRESS OF REFUGEES AND ASYLUM SEEKERS AND OTHER MIGRANTS AND THEIR FAMILIES IN THE FOLKESTONE AREA AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH PERSONS. 2. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE NEEDS OF REFUGEES AND ASYLUM SEEKERS AND OTHER MIGRANTS AND THEIR FAMILIES BY STIMULATING COMMUNITY SPIRIT AND NETWORKING WITH OTHER RELEVANT AGENCIES.
Organisation type
Other
Registration history
  • 06 November 2001 : registered
  • 08 July 2014 : removed (CEASED TO EXIST)
Other names

No other names

What the charity did
  • Education/training
  • Accommodation/housing
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
  • Recreation
Who the charity helped
  • Children/young People
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
How the charity helped
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information