Financial history ANIMALS ASIA FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1086903
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £3.67m £2.62m £2.32m £2.59m £3.04m
Total expenditure £3.31m £2.61m £2.66m £2.72m £2.77m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £31.14k
Income - Donations and legacies £3.59m £2.46m £2.23m £2.54m £2.99m
Income - Other trading activities £72.32k £131.35k £91.31k £53.50k £24.53k
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £579 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £5.30k £25.23k £0 £1.66k £31.57k
Income - Legacies £553.76k £699.80k £397.39k £418.70k £206.57k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.90m £2.09m £2.19m £2.22m £2.25m
Expenditure - Raising funds £406.64k £512.62k £461.16k £499.43k £520.83k
Expenditure - Governance £7.50k £9.30k £9.90k £8.07k £9.87k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £5.23k