BEDFORDSHIRE AFRICAN SUPPORT PROJECT

Charity number: 1090193
Removed charity
Governing document
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 4 AUGUST 2000 AS AMENDED 20 OCTOBER 2001, 29 JUNE 2002 & 9 SEPTEMBER 2006.
Charitable objects
1. FOR THE RELIEF OF ALL PEOPLE FROM THE DEMOCRATIC REPUBLIC OF CONGO, REPUBLIC OF CONGO, ANGOLA AND OTHER AREAS OF THE BLACK AFRICAN SUB-CONTINENT WHO ARE NOW LIVING IN BEDFORDSHIRE AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS WHO ARE: IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS, WHO ARE SICK, CONVALESCENT, DISABLED OR INFIRM BY RELIEVING THEIR SUFFERING OR ASSISTING THEIR RECOVERY. 2. TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND TO PRESERVE THE HEALTH OF THE CHILDREN AND WOMEN RESIDING PERMANENTLY OR TEMPORARILY IN COUNTRIES OF SUB-SAHARAN AFRICA BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES, SUPPORT SERVICES AND EQUIPMENT. 3. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE CHILDREN AND WOMEN RESIDING PERMANENTLY OR TEMPORARILY IN COUNTRIES OF SUB-SAHARAN AFRICA BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES, MATERIALS AND EQUIPMENT.
Organisation type
Other
Registration history
  • 22 January 2002 : registered
  • 02 June 2011 : removed (CEASED TO EXIST)
Other names
  • BEDFORDSHIRE CONGOLESE COMMUNITY LINKS (Previous name)
What the charity did
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helped
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helped
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information