Financial history ONE PLUS ONE MARRIAGE AND PARTNERSHIP RESEARCH

Charity number: 1087994
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £772.63k £747.63k £598.27k £532.30k £602.16k
Total expenditure £915.30k £864.37k £648.25k £577.81k £591.79k
Income from government contracts £598.20k £564.19k £76.80k £98.15k N/A
Income from government grants N/A £52.70k £503.59k £428.46k £151.27k
Income - Donations and legacies £31.88k £60.67k £4.58k £4.06k £6.60k
Income - Other trading activities £86.63k £102.14k £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £651.53k £582.11k £592.83k £527.61k £594.98k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.12k £1.37k £835 £395 £147
Income - Other £1.47k £1.35k £23 £244 £421
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £859.99k £849.27k £616.57k £558.58k £505.68k
Expenditure - Raising funds £55.31k £15.10k £31.68k £19.23k £86.11k
Expenditure - Governance £33.49k £28.65k £35.38k £19.29k £32.23k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0