EAST HAMPSHIRE FEDERATION OF TOWNSWOMEN'S GUILDS

Charity number: 1086102
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2021 23 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2020 20 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2019 08 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2018 29 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2017 08 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2017 Not Required