EAST HAMPSHIRE FEDERATION OF TOWNSWOMEN'S GUILDS

Charity number: 1086102
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/01/2017 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020 31/01/2021
Total gross income £20.92k £24.19k £17.85k £18.54k £2.30k
Total expenditure £20.51k £25.08k £17.45k £18.19k £2.51k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A