EAST HAMPSHIRE FEDERATION OF TOWNSWOMEN'S GUILDS

Charity number: 1086102
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PATRICIA SCOTNEY Trustee 04 April 2014 None on record
Kate Isobel Jeffreys Trustee 09 March 2018 None on record
Madeleine Dougal Trustee 02 January 2020 None on record
Margaret M Leigh Trustee 10 September 2018 None on record
Davina Staffordowen Trustee 09 March 2018 None on record
Sheila Taylor Trustee 04 April 2014 None on record
MARGARET HELEN FRANCIS Trustee 09 March 2018 None on record
MISS L G DAVIES Trustee 29 November 2011 None on record
Joanne Heidi Johnson Trustee 09 March 2018 None on record
WENDY MAVIS LINNETT Trustee None on record
Marjorie Brand Trustee 08 May 2019
PORTCHESTER (E) TOWNSWOMEN'S GUILD Received: On time
MRS G BAILEY Trustee None on record