Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF ROCK PARK

Charity number: 1088914
Charity reporting is overdue by 124 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 124 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 124 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 08 November 2022 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 22 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 10 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 31 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required