Financial history FRIENDS OF ROCK PARK

Charity number: 1088914
Charity reporting is overdue by 115 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £599 £596 £1.22k £230 £1.32k
Total expenditure £388 £1.05k £573 £207 £340
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A