COMMUNITY CHILDCARE CENTRES

Charity number: 1086957
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity provides childcare education for children aged from 6 months, up to and including 11 years. Growing Places is a charitable company, committed to enhancing lives, raising aspirations and creating opportunities for all stakeholders (children, their families, employees and volunteers). For more information please see www.growingplaces.org.uk.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Hampshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 07 June 2001: Standard registration
  • 05 April 2017: Funds received from 1023014 COWPLAIN COMMUNITY PRESCHOOL
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • CCC (Working name)
  • GROWING PLACES (Working name)
  • JUBILEE CORNER DAY NURSERY (Working name)
  • OAK MEADOW CHILDCARE CENTRE (Working name)
  • STAUNTON PARK DAY NURSERY (Working name)
  • WAITE END DAY NURSERY (Working name)
  • COMMUNITY CHILDCARE CENTRES LTD (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MATTHEW GOODWIN Chair 14 March 2013
None on record
Graham Allan Trustee 24 July 2024
None on record
Paul Conroy Trustee 21 June 2024
None on record
Nadine Walsh-Gonzalez Trustee 05 February 2024
None on record
Sara Caine Trustee 30 October 2023
None on record
Lynne Tandy Trustee 29 May 2023
None on record
Sophy Louth Trustee 14 December 2021
None on record
Stephanie Rose Cufley Trustee 14 December 2021
None on record
Michael Fountain Trustee 26 November 2018
None on record
SUE CLEAVELEY Trustee 14 January 2016
None on record
JACQUELINE WARREN Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £2.31m £2.25m £2.64m £2.71m £2.73m
Total expenditure £2.31m £2.22m £2.43m £2.75m £2.72m
Income from government contracts N/A £1.87m £1.09m £1.11m £1.22m
Income from government grants £1.06m £314.83k £49.30k £72.19k £44.39k
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £332.50k £58.09k £72.38k £43.62k
Income - Other trading activities £2.31m £908 £1.88k £1.05k £2.52k
Income - Charitable activities £0 £1.92m £2.58m £2.63m £2.68m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.49k £303 £111 £3.43k £12.51k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £444.81k £2.19m £2.42m £2.75m £2.72m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.86m £24.60k £12.60k £6.74k £3.86k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £11.32k £7.74k £8.12k £8.22k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £825 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £296.16k £291.48k £317.00k £456.56k £431.80k
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Other assets £731.82k £788.35k £965.80k £789.12k £857.09k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £57.24k £93.81k £87.75k £97.65k £130.57k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 22 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 22 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 24 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 24 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 31 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 31 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 13 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 13 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 22 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 22 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
GROWING PLACES @ MILL HILL
MILL ROAD
WATERLOOVILLE
HAMPSHIRE
PO7 7DB
Phone:
02392266004