SOUTH ESSEX PARTNERSHIP UNIVERSITY NHS FOUNDATION TRUST OTHER LOCALITY SERVICES GENERAL FUND

Charity number: 1053793-34
Removed charity
Governing document
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 30/09/1996 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 02/11/2000 AS AMENDED BY STATUTORY INSTRUMENT DATED 13/03/2005 AS AMENDED BY ORDER DATED 29/03/2010
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEE SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUND UPON TRUST TO APPLY THE INCOME AND AT THEIR DISCRETION AND SO FAR AS MAY BE PERMISSIBLE THE CAPITAL FOR ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES RELATING TO COMMUNITY SERVICES IN THE AREA SERVED BY THE OTHER LOCALITY SERVICES AT SOUTH ESSEX PARTNERSHIP UNIVERSITY NHS FOUNDATION TRUST
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 10 April 2001: Standard registration
  • 26 June 2017: Removed (Does not operate)
Other names
  • BEDFORDSHIRE AND LUTON MENTAL HEALTH AND SOCIAL CARE PARTNERSHIP NHS TRUST OTHER LOCALITY SERVICES GENERAL FUND (Previous name)
  • BEDFORSHIRE AND LUTON COMMUNITY NHS TRUST OTHER LOCALITY SERVICES GENERAL FUND (Previous name)