Register of Charities - The Charity Commission SOUTH ESSEX PARTNERSHIP UNIVERSITY NHS FOUNDATION TRUST VERANDAH PROJECT FUND
Charity number: 1053793-35
Removed charity
Governing document
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 30/09/1996
AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 02/11/2000
AS AMENDED BY STATUTORY INSTRUMENT DATED 13/03/2005
AS AMENDED BY ORDER DATED 29/03/2010
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUND UPON TRUST TO APPLY THE INCOME AND AT THEIR DISCRETION SO FAR AS MAY BE PERMISSIBLE THE CAPITAL FOR ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES PRINCIPALLY IN CONNECTION WITH THE REMINISCENCE THERAPY OF ELDERLY PATIENTS TREATED AT STEPPINGLEY HOSPITAL TO ENHANCE THEIR STANDARD OF LIVING WITHIN THE SOUTH ESSEX PARTNERSHIP UNIVERSITY NHS FOUNDATION TRUST
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
- 10 April 2001: Standard registration
- 26 June 2017: Removed (Does not operate)
Other names
- BEDFORDSHIRE AND LUTON MENTAL HEALTH AND SOCIAL CARE PARTNERSHIP NHS TRUST VERANDAH PROJECT FUND (Previous name)
- BEDFORDSHIRE AND LUTON NHS COMMUNITY NHS TRUST VERANDAH PROJECT FUND (Previous name)
This charity is a linked charity of
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.