WESSEX GARDEN SCHOOLS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1086250
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

None

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 01 April 2024

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Barnet

Governance

Registration history:
  • 24 April 2001: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Ruth Charteris Trustee 19 November 2018
None on record
Alexander Banks Trustee 01 September 2015
None on record
JILL SUMMERS Trustee
None on record
FRANKLIN DANNENBERG Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/04/2020 01/04/2021 01/04/2022 01/04/2023 01/04/2024
Total gross income £0 £0 £24 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 April 2024 28 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2023 12 March 2024 40 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2022 13 March 2023 40 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2021 16 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2020 16 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
WESSEX GARDENS PRIMARY SCHOOL
WESSEX GARDENS
LONDON
NW11 9RR
Phone:
02084559572