Oxygen - Kingston Youth

Charity number: 1086608
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £240.95k £188.89k £249.37k £247.87k £182.62k
Total expenditure £224.35k £208.71k £230.55k £245.50k £154.53k
Income from government contracts £7.00k £0 £6.94k £12.06k £12.01k
Income from government grants £4.90k £10.20k £63.00k £37.50k £48.53k