Accounts and annual returns RIVERHEAD INFANTS' SCHOOL FUND

Charity number: 1086548
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 February 2021 21 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 21 December 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 10 August 2020 41 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 10 August 2020 41 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2018 26 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 26 April 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2017 11 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 11 January 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2016 07 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 07 November 2016 On time Download Open in new window