Trustees RIVERHEAD INFANTS' SCHOOL FUND

Charity number: 1086548
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
TIINA MUTRU Chair 23 March 2015
None on record
William Swain Trustee 29 November 2021
None on record
Sara Fazzin Trustee 29 November 2021
None on record
Tomaso Spingardi Trustee 05 July 2021
None on record
Sarah Munns Trustee 18 May 2021
None on record
James Turner Trustee 12 May 2021
None on record
Archanna Ramu Trustee 18 December 2019
None on record
Nicholas Pocknall Trustee 14 May 2018
None on record
Clare Smeaton Trustee 13 April 2018
None on record
Karl Fuhrmann Trustee 14 May 2017
None on record
HELENE BLIGH Trustee 12 September 2014
None on record
CLAIRE DAVISON Trustee 14 November 2012
None on record