THE ASSOCIATION FOR FOSTER CARERS AND ADOPTIVE PARENTS IN SOUTHEND- ON- SEA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
AFCAPS has carried out no activity in this financial year
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Essex
- Southend-on-sea
Governance
- 07 August 2001: Standard registration
- AFCAPS (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jo Twyman | Chair | 13 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
MARIAN WITHER | Trustee | 13 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
PAUL MAYNARD | Trustee | 17 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA EVANS | Trustee | 17 July 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £829 | £2.60k | £2.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £305 | £2.42k | £1.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 September 2024 | 324 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 08 August 2024 | 647 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 March 2021 | 142 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 9TH JULY 2001
Charitable objects
THE ASSOCIATION IS ESTABLISHED TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC WITHIN THE COUNTY BOROUGH OF SOUTHEND-ON-SEA IN MATTERS RELATING TO THE CARE OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE, IN PARTICULAR THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF FOSTER CARERS AND ADOPTIVE PARENTS AND TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AND SERVICES TO RELIEVE THE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, OR OTHER CHARITABLE NEEDS OF SUCH CARERS AND THE CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN THEIR CARE.
Area of benefit
COUNTY BOROUGH OF SOUTHEND-ON-SEA
Contact information
- Address:
-
52 Southview Road
Hockley
SS5 5DY
- Phone:
- 01702205078
- Email:
- barbara.evans52@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window