ROSLYN FLORENCE HARDING

Charity number: 1087005
Charity reporting is up to date (7 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 07 February 2021 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 07 February 2021 7 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 11 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 11 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 04 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 04 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 21 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 21 November 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 13 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 13 November 2016 On time Download