Financial history THE HILL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1086396
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £428.13k £458.98k £1.22m £1.25m £1.10m
Total expenditure £660.61k £578.84k £1.04m £896.76k £1.33m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £589.00k £564.00k £564.00k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A £630.08k £688.47k £538.22k
Income - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 £564.00k £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £964.60k £819.04k £1.25m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £77.18k £77.72k £82.58k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £10.18k £9.46k £17.30k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £909.42k £765.87k £1.20m
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £77.18k £77.72k £79.70k
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £0