Financial history THROUGH THE ROOF CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1087788
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £246.90k £251.92k £382.51k £312.84k £317.17k
Total expenditure £277.19k £274.97k £335.58k £296.81k £228.34k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £5.81k