Financial history FRIENDS OF ST MARY'S HOUND

Charity number: 1090948
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £2.85k £3.59k £3.68k £3.51k £1.49k
Total expenditure £1.37k £1.30k £440 £600 £588
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A